U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03631
  • Case Name: RMP Residential 1 LLC v. United States Internal Revenue Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.