U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02785
  • Case Name: Auto-Owners Insurance Company v. My Fleet LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.