U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00802
  • Case Name: Media Trademark and Licensing Limited v. LONDONBLOCKCHAIN.COM
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 10, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • March 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.