U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-08158
  • Case Name: Gilligan #075946 v. Arizona, State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Produce]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Habeas Petition (State/2254)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.