U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01516
  • Case Name: Armored Group LLC v. Lutzker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.