U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03521
  • Case Name: Lutzker et al v. Armored Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 10, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.