U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Jerald #351198 v. Nanos et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order (Service Packet)]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.