U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00715
  • Case Name: Derello #037292 v. Thayer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.