U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03062--DMF
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Unknown Party
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA ]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.