U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08041
  • Case Name: Jarvis et al v. LVNV Funding LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 20, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Ruling]
  • March 18, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 12, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.