U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03020
  • Case Name: Snelgrove v. Avenue5 Residential LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.