U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00797
  • Case Name: Toohey v. CWT US LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • March 10, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 10, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.