U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02798
  • Case Name: Lane et al v. Rocket Mortgage LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.