U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-08554
  • Case Name: Jura v. Northern Arizona Healthcare Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.