U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02279
  • Case Name: Castillo et al v. Yuma County Board of Supervisors et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 03, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.