U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08034
  • Case Name: Watson et al v. Peck et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Recusal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Recusal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.