U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00046
  • Case Name: West v. Applicant Check LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.