U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03536
  • Case Name: Wells Fargo Bank NA v. LHS Finance LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Application]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.