U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Serrano v. Maricopa, County of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.