U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Crews v. Blackrock Debt Relief Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 27, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
  • April 07, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 06, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 06, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 23, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.