U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00235
  • Case Name: KC Turbos LLC v. Turbo Charger Systems Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.