U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02008
  • Case Name: Bollinger #328092 v. NaphCare Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Appeal of Mag Judge Decision to Dist Ct (Rule 72(a) Objection)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.