U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01964
  • Case Name: GG Insurance Services Incorporated v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response]
  • March 26, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.