U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02414
  • Case Name: Friddle v. CoreCivic et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order (Service Packet)]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.