U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00361
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $121,100.00 in US Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 16, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
  • April 15, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.