U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Levy v. Sonoran Rovers LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.