U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Scenic Arizona v. Scenic America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.