U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00555
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Khatri LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 26, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 12, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.