U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02327
  • Case Name: Baldwin v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.