U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Li v. Discover Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.