U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03503
  • Case Name: Girard v. Maricopa, County of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Default Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.