U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03038
  • Case Name: Brindley v. Mercedes-Benz USA LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.