U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Elisworth v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation]
  • March 24, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 24, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 24, 2025: [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Request for E-Notices]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - SS Action Commenced]
  • March 11, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.