U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Fernandez v. American West Worldwide Express Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.