U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00987
  • Case Name: Campos et al v. Arizona Board of Regents et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 24, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.