U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02987
  • Case Name: 1789 Foundation Incorporated et al v. Fontes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.