U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02620
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Christian Care Management Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript Request]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.