U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01154
  • Case Name: Nevarez v. Mesa, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Case Reopened]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Hearing ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerks Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.