U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03376
  • Case Name: Durand v. Gila River Resorts and Casinos et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.