U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Stone v. EasyKnock Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Report - Status]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.