U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03690
  • Case Name: Santos v. BackChecked LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.