U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Ehrenfried v. Brothers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.