U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02894
  • Case Name: Fleet Connect Solutions LLC v. GPS Insight Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information]
  • April 07, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.