U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02730
  • Case Name: Fire Security Electronics & Communications Incorporated v. Nye et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.