U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00814
  • Case Name: Parry v. Paper Magic Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.