U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00691
  • Case Name: Frouws et al v. Edgio Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.