U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03454
  • Case Name: Austin v. Mogollon Treatment Center LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report - Status]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Counterclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.