U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Titan Concepts International LLC v. Kraze Trucking LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.