U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Kessler v. VectraRx Mail Pharmacy Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.