U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03195
  • Case Name: Modulus Global Incorporated v. Gruhn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Vacate Hearing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • March 18, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.